Legislature | 05/14/2025 | Presented to Governor on May 14, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 05/14/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 05/14/2025 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 | ||
Legislature | 05/14/2025 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | ||
Legislature | 05/12/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 05/08/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 05/08/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER69 adopted | ||
Legislature | 05/06/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER69 filed | ||
Legislature | 05/06/2025 | Placed on Select File with ER69 | ||
Legislature | 04/29/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 04/29/2025 | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1111 adopted | ||
Legislature | 04/29/2025 | DeBoer AM1189 adopted | ||
Legislature | 04/29/2025 | DeBoer AM1189 to AM1111 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/24/2025 | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1111 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/24/2025 | Placed on General File with AM1111 | ||
Legislature | 03/13/2025 | Transportation and Telecommunications priority bill | ||
Legislature | 01/31/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/15/2025 | Date of introduction |