Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB311 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 10, 2025
Bill January 15, 2025

Engrossed

Bill May 12, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 12, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis April 24, 2025
Analysis February 5, 2025