Legislature | 04/25/2025 | Ballard AM1142 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/22/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 04/16/2025 | Hallstrom AM1092 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/16/2025 | Hallstrom AM1095 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/16/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 04/16/2025 | Judiciary AM767 adopted | ||
Legislature | 04/16/2025 | McKinney MO181 failed | ||
Legislature | 04/16/2025 | Clouse MO182 prevailed | ||
Legislature | 04/16/2025 | Clouse MO182 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/16/2025 | McKinney MO181 Reconsider the vote taken on MO107 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/16/2025 | DeBoer MO107 failed | ||
Legislature | 04/15/2025 | DeBoer MO107 pending | ||
Legislature | 04/15/2025 | Judiciary AM767 pending | ||
Legislature | 04/15/2025 | DeBoer MO180 failed | ||
Legislature | 04/15/2025 | DeBoer MO180 pending | ||
Legislature | 04/15/2025 | DeBoer MO180 Reconsider the vote taken on MO106 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/15/2025 | DeBoer MO106 failed | ||
Legislature | 04/15/2025 | DeBoer MO106 pending | ||
Legislature | 04/09/2025 | Ballard AM991 to AM767 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/31/2025 | Judiciary AM767 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/31/2025 | Placed on General File with AM767 | ||
Legislature | 03/27/2025 | DeBoer FA63 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/27/2025 | DeBoer FA62 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/27/2025 | DeBoer FA61 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/27/2025 | DeBoer FA60 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/19/2025 | DeBoer MO108 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed | ||
Legislature | 03/19/2025 | DeBoer MO107 Bracket until June 9, 2025 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/19/2025 | DeBoer MO106 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed | ||
Legislature | 03/06/2025 | Clouse priority bill | ||
Legislature | 01/28/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/21/2025 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/16/2025 | Date of introduction |