Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB322 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 22, 2025
Fiscal Note February 11, 2025
Bill January 16, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis March 31, 2025
Analysis February 7, 2025