Legislature
|
04/29/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ST25 recorded
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/29/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ST25 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/29/2025
|
Placed on Final Reading with ST25
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/23/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/23/2025
|
Hardin AM1154 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/23/2025
|
Hardin AM1154 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/23/2025
|
Hardin AM1117 withdrawn
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/23/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ER42 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Hardin AM1117 to ER42 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/09/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ER42 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Select File with ER42
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/02/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/02/2025
|
Health and Human Services AM729 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/02/2025
|
Hardin AM828 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/31/2025
|
Hardin AM828 to AM729 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/20/2025
|
Health and Human Services AM729 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/20/2025
|
Placed on General File with AM729
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/13/2025
|
Health and Human Services priority bill
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/05/2025
|
Notice of hearing for February 19, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/16/2025
|
Date of introduction
|
|
|