Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB332 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 15, 2025
Fiscal Note February 18, 2025
Bill January 16, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis March 20, 2025
Analysis February 18, 2025