Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB362 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 24, 2025
Bill January 16, 2025

Engrossed

Bill February 24, 2025

Enrolled

Bill February 24, 2025

Chaptered

Bill March 12, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis January 29, 2025
Analysis January 22, 2025
Analysis January 22, 2025