Legislature | 05/01/2025 | Approved by Governor on April 29, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/25/2025 | Presented to Governor on April 25, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/25/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 04/25/2025 | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 | ||
Legislature | 04/25/2025 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | ||
Legislature | 04/22/2025 | Enrollment and Review ST21 recorded | ||
Legislature | 04/22/2025 | Enrollment and Review ST21 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/22/2025 | Placed on Final Reading with ST21 | ||
Legislature | 04/17/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 03/17/2025 | Speaker priority bill | ||
Legislature | 03/11/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Legislature | 02/06/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/22/2025 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/17/2025 | Date of introduction |