Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB388 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 20, 2025
Bill January 17, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 22, 2025

Chaptered

Bill May 1, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis March 11, 2025
Analysis February 18, 2025