Legislature | 03/17/2025 | Approved by Governor on March 17, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 03/13/2025 | Presented to Governor on March 13, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 03/13/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 03/13/2025 | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 | ||
Legislature | 03/13/2025 | Cavanaugh, M. FA37 withdrawn | ||
Legislature | 03/13/2025 | Cavanaugh, M. FA37 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/10/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 02/28/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 02/24/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 02/19/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 02/07/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Legislature | 01/28/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/22/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/17/2025 | Date of introduction |