Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB396 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 5, 2025
Bill January 17, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2025

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2025

Chaptered

Bill March 17, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis February 7, 2025
Analysis January 30, 2025