Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB396 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/05/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Scott Danigole 
LB 396 DATE PREPARED: January 22, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0055 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 396 changes provisions related to public power district budgets and audits. 
 
Under LB 396, a public power district’s budget is no longer required to be “in a form approved by the Nebraska Power Review Board.” 
Additionally, public power district	s are audited, a copy of the audit is no longer required to be kept on file by the Nebraska Power 
Review Board. 
 
No fiscal impact. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB:  396             AM:                         AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Auditor of Public Accounts 
   
REVIEWED BY:  	Joe Massey                     DATE: 1/22/2025                                         	PHONE: (402) 471-4181 
   
COMMENTS: No basis to disagree with the Nebraska Auditor of Public Accounts assessment of no fiscal impact 
from LB 396 
   
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB:  396             AM:                         AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Power Review Board 
   
REVIEWED BY:  	Joe Massey                     DATE: 1/22/2025                                         PHONE: (402) 471-4181 
   
COMMENTS: No basis to disagree with the Nebraska Power Review Board assessment of no fiscal impact from LB 396    
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 396 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Auditor of Public Accounts 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Craig Kubicek Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/21/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-326-3063 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
$0   $0  
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
$0   $0  
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
$0   $0  
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
$0   $0  
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
$0   $0  
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
 
No impact. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1)     396 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
   Nebraska Power Review Board 
 
Prepared by: 
(3)    Tim Texel 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 January 21, 2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-2301 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
 
No Fiscal Impact 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements………… …………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....