Legislature
|
05/14/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ST34 recorded
|
|
|
Legislature
|
05/14/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ST34 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
05/14/2025
|
Placed on Final Reading with ST34
|
|
|
Legislature
|
05/09/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
|
|
|
Legislature
|
05/09/2025
|
Jacobson FA201 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
05/09/2025
|
Jacobson FA201 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
05/09/2025
|
Wordekemper AM1334 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
05/09/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ER56 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
05/07/2025
|
Wordekemper AM1334 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/29/2025
|
Placed on Select File with ER56
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/29/2025
|
Enrollment and Review ER56 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/23/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/23/2025
|
Wordekemper AM494 withdrawn
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/23/2025
|
Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM750 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/15/2025
|
Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM750 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/15/2025
|
Placed on General File with AM750
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/14/2025
|
Armendariz priority bill
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/06/2025
|
Wordekemper AM494 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
02/24/2025
|
Notice of hearing for March 06, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/23/2025
|
Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/21/2025
|
Date of introduction
|
|
|