Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB434 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 13, 2025
Fiscal Note April 30, 2025
Fiscal Note March 5, 2025
Bill January 21, 2025

Engrossed

Bill May 14, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis April 15, 2025
Analysis February 28, 2025