Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB434 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/05/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Scott Danigole 
LB 434 DATE PREPARED: March 04, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0055 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS  See Below  $1,900,000 
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS  See Below  $1,900,000 
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached f	ollowing the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 434 changes fees charged by the Fire Marshal. 
 
The following fee changes are included in LB 434: 
 
 
Fee Type 	Old Rate 	New Rate 
Fireworks display permit 	$10 	$100 
Fireworks Distributor’s License 	$500 	$1,000 
Fireworks Jobber’s License 	$200 	$400 
Fireworks Retailer’s License 	$25 	$100 
Fire Alarm Inspections 	NTE $100 NTE $200 
State Fire Code inspection and compliance, late submittal 	$50 50% of Projected cost 
Fire Safety Inspections 	$25-$150 	$50-$300 
Plan Reviews* 	NTE $500 NTE $10,000 
Plan Reviews for accessibility standards and specifications NTE $250 NTE $5,000 
Water Based Fire Protection Certificate (and renewals) NTE $100 NTE $200 
Tank Registration for farm or residential (one-time fee) 	$5 	$10 
Tank Installation Permit 	$50 	$75 
Tank Registration Permit (annual) 	$30 	$60 
 
*Effective July 1, 2026 
 
NTE = Not to exceed 
 
The Fire Marshal estimates the total additional cash fund revenue 	from the fee changes to be $1,900,000 	annually.  The projections are 
based on historical data. There is no basis to disagree with these estimates. 
 
The Fire Marshal estimates additional cash fund revenue in FY27.  LB 434 has no effective date, therefore, increased revenue should 
be realized in FY26.  This is true for all proposed fee changes except for Plan Reviews, which are specified to be increased July 1, 
2026 (FY27).  It is assumed that the bill’s enactment will result in an effective date of 90 days after the end of the Le	gislative Session.  
The result will be an undetermined amou nt of Cash Fund revenue in FY	26. 
 
The Fire Marshal also estimates a General Fund revenue decrease of $2,500,000 in FY27.  From their submitted narrative, it appears 
as though the Fire Marshal’s intent is to show a General Fund expenditure reduction.  LB 434 does not affect General Fund revenue. 
 
LB 434 only addresses fees and, therefore, Cash Fund revenue increases.  Once Cash Fund revenue increases are realized, the ability 
to shift funding to reduce 	General Fund reliance and increase 	Cash Fund reliance is possible.  That can be addressed through the 
normal budget and/or midbiennium budget adjustment processes. 
 
 
 
 
  ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & P OLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB:   434                  AM:                            	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: State Fire Marshal 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                           DATE:   3/4/2025                               PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the State Fire Marshal’s estimated fiscal impact as a result of LB 434. The amounts shown in 
the “Revenue” columns are related to appropriations of the agency. 
   
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 434 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
State Fire Marshal 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Regina Shields/ Deb 
Hostetler 
Date Prepared: 
(4)
 3/03/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-9477 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    - 2,500,000 
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    1,900,000 
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    -600,000 
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
LB 434 was introduced on behalf of the State Fire Marshal Agency to allow for increased revenue generated 
by the services provided by the Agency.  The amounts generated are based on increases in inspection fees, 
increased registration fees, increased licensing fees, and increased fees for the review of submitted plans, 
blueprints, and shop drawings. Many of the fee/registra	tion/licensing amounts listed within the bill are being 
doubled. The projected increase from these is approximately $500,000 and the remaining projected increase to 
the $1.9 million will come from the increase in the sliding scale associated with the plans review process.  All 
these amounts are projections based on historical data as all items are based solely on requests and 
submittals received by the Agency.  The $2.5 million decrease will be included in the general budget bill for 
Umbrella program 193.  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements…………… ………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....