Legislature | 04/08/2025 | Approved by Governor on April 7, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Presented to Governor on April 3, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | ||
Legislature | 03/19/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 03/11/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 03/05/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 02/27/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 02/11/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Legislature | 01/28/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/23/2025 | Referred to Revenue Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/21/2025 | Date of introduction |