Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB501 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 4, 2025
Bill January 21, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 19, 2025

Enrolled

Bill March 19, 2025

Chaptered

Bill April 8, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis February 11, 2025
Analysis January 28, 2025