Legislature | 04/29/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 04/24/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 04/24/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER43 adopted | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Enrollment and Review ER43 filed | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Placed on Select File with ER43 | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Revenue AM691 adopted | ||
Legislature | 03/27/2025 | Revenue AM691 filed | ||
Legislature | 03/27/2025 | Placed on General File with AM691 | ||
Legislature | 03/14/2025 | Jacobson priority bill | ||
Legislature | 02/04/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/24/2025 | Referred to Revenue Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/22/2025 | Date of introduction |