Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB526 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 7, 2025
Fiscal Note February 11, 2025
Bill January 22, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis March 26, 2025
Analysis February 4, 2025