Legislature | 04/29/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 04/24/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 04/22/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 04/09/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 04/09/2025 | Transportation and Telecommunications AM395 adopted | ||
Legislature | 03/17/2025 | Speaker priority bill | ||
Legislature | 02/28/2025 | Transportation and Telecommunications AM395 filed | ||
Legislature | 02/28/2025 | Placed on General File with AM395 | ||
Legislature | 02/07/2025 | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/24/2025 | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/22/2025 | Date of introduction |