Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB667 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 15, 2025
Fiscal Note February 14, 2025
Bill January 22, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis February 27, 2025
Analysis February 10, 2025