Legislature
|
04/29/2025
|
Placed on Select File
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Hunt MO192 Recommit to the Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Hunt MO191 Indefinitely postpone filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Hunt MO190 Recommit to the Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Hunt MO189 Bracket until June 9, 2025 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Riepe AM1138 to AM701 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Conrad FA122 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Conrad FA121 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Conrad FA120 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Hunt FA123 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Dungan FA119 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Dungan FA118 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM701 adopted
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Hunt MO5 failed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Kauth MO193 prevailed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Kauth MO193 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Hunt MO185 failed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Hunt MO185 Reconsider the vote taken on MO4 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/22/2025
|
Hunt MO4 failed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
04/11/2025
|
Kauth AM1024 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/25/2025
|
Placed on General File with AM701
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/25/2025
|
Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM701 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
03/04/2025
|
Kauth priority bill
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/29/2025
|
Notice of hearing for February 07, 2025
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/14/2025
|
Hunt MO6 Recommit to the Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/14/2025
|
Hunt MO5 Bracket until June 9, 2025 filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/14/2025
|
Hunt MO4 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/14/2025
|
Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/13/2025
|
Meyer name added
|
|
|
Legislature
|
01/10/2025
|
Date of introduction
|
|
|