Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB89 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 23, 2025
Fiscal Note February 6, 2025
Bill January 10, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis March 21, 2025
Analysis January 29, 2025