New Jersey 2022-2023 Regular Session

New Jersey Assembly Bill A5362

Introduced
3/30/23  
Refer
3/30/23  
Report Pass
5/11/23  
Report Pass
5/18/23  
Engrossed
5/25/23  

Caption

Makes supplemental appropriation of $1.5 million to Election Law Enforcement Commission in DLPS for enforcement and staffing activities.

Impact

The bill is significant as it directly affects the enforcement capabilities of the ELEC. With the increased funding, the commission can hire more personnel and enhance its operational capacity to oversee compliance with campaign finance laws. This is crucial for maintaining the integrity of electoral processes in New Jersey, as robust enforcement helps prevent violations that could undermine public trust in elections. The funding will specifically be allocated to activities that support the enforcement of the law and to ensure adequate staffing within the commission.

Summary

A5362 is a bill introduced in the New Jersey legislature that makes a supplemental appropriation of $1.5 million to the Election Law Enforcement Commission (ELEC) within the Department of Law and Public Safety. The purpose of this appropriation is to bolster staffing and to enhance enforcement activities related to the state’s campaign finance laws as outlined in the New Jersey Campaign Contributions and Expenditures Reporting Act. By providing additional funding, the bill aims to ensure that the ELEC has the necessary resources to effectively administer and enforce these regulations.

Contention

While the bill received substantial support, there may be underlying tensions regarding the allocation of funds for election enforcement amidst broader budgetary constraints. Some legislators may question the need for increased funding in this area versus other pressing state priorities. However, the overarching sentiment is that maintaining accountability in campaign finance is vital for the health of democratic processes, thus justifying the appropriation in the eyes of many lawmakers.

Companion Bills

NJ S3869

Same As Makes supplemental appropriation of $1.5 million to Election Law Enforcement Commission in DLPS for enforcement and staffing activities.

Similar Bills

MD HB350

Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2025)

MD SB360

Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2025)

MD SB181

Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2024)

MD HB200

Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2024)

PA HB611

To provide appropriations from the General Fund for the expenses of the Executive, Legislative and Judicial Departments of the Commonwealth, the public debt and the public schools for the fiscal year July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2024, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023; to provide appropriations from special funds and accounts to the Executive and Judicial Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2024, and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023; to provide for the appropriation of Federal funds to the Executive and Judicial Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2024, and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023; and to provide for the additional appropriation of Federal and State funds to the Executive and Legislative Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2023, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022.

MD HB350

Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2026)

MD SB319

Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2026)

MD SB290

Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2023)