New Jersey 2022-2023 Regular Session

New Jersey Senate Bill S3869

Introduced
5/15/23  

Caption

Makes supplemental appropriation of $1.5 million to Election Law Enforcement Commission in DLPS for enforcement and staffing activities.

Companion Bills

NJ A5362

Same As Makes supplemental appropriation of $1.5 million to Election Law Enforcement Commission in DLPS for enforcement and staffing activities.

Similar Bills

MD SB360

Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2025)

MD HB350

Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2025)

MD SB181

Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2024)

MD HB200

Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2024)

PA HB611

To provide appropriations from the General Fund for the expenses of the Executive, Legislative and Judicial Departments of the Commonwealth, the public debt and the public schools for the fiscal year July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2024, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023; to provide appropriations from special funds and accounts to the Executive and Judicial Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2024, and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023; to provide for the appropriation of Federal funds to the Executive and Judicial Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2024, and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023; and to provide for the additional appropriation of Federal and State funds to the Executive and Legislative Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2023, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022.

MD HB350

Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2026)

MD SB319

Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2026)

MD HB300

Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2023)