LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New Jersey NJ
Legislatures
2022-2023 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
A5511
Action History
NJ
New Jersey Assembly Bill A5511
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New Jersey 2022-2023 Regular Session
New Jersey Assembly Bill A5511
Action History
Senate
11/27/2023
Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Assembly
06/30/2023
Passed by the Assembly (61-14-1)
Assembly
06/22/2023
Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Assembly
06/15/2023
Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Assembly
05/25/2023
Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee