LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New Jersey NJ
Legislatures
2022-2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S1006
Action History
NJ
New Jersey Senate Bill S1006
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New Jersey 2022-2023 Regular Session
New Jersey Senate Bill S1006
Action History
Assembly
01/10/2023
Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Senate
12/19/2022
Passed by the Senate (24-13)
Senate
10/31/2022
Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Senate
03/10/2022
Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Senate
01/31/2022
Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee