Assembly | 06/28/2024 | Approved P.L.2024, c.26. | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2024 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-1-0) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Passed by the Senate (34-2) | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Substituted for S1287 (1R) | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | Passed by the Assembly (75-2-0) | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2024 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |