New Jersey 2024-2025 Regular Session

New Jersey Assembly Bill A1669 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2024
Bill December 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 10, 2024

Amended

Bill May 14, 2024