LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Nevada NV
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB405
Action History
NV
Nevada Senate Bill SB405
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Nevada 2023 Regular Session
Nevada Senate Bill SB405
Action History
Senate
06/06/2023
(No further action taken.)
Senate
04/03/2023
Waiver granted effective: March 30, 2023.
Senate
03/28/2023
From printer. To committee.
Senate
03/27/2023
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.