Senate | 05/30/2023 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 101. (Effective May 30, 2023) | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | In Senate. To enrollment. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | Read second time. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | From committee: Do pass. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | In Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Read first time. To committee. | ||
Senate | 12/01/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 11/16/2022 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |