Senate | 06/16/2023 | Chapter 518. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Approved by the Governor. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2023 | In Senate. To enrollment. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2023 | Read second time. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | Taken from Second Reading File. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | Placed on Second Reading File. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | From committee: Do pass. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | In Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 6, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2023 | Placed on General File. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Exemption effective. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Read first time. To committee. | ||
Senate | 12/01/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 11/16/2022 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |