Senate | 05/31/2023 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 105. (Effective July 1, 2023) | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | In Senate. To enrollment. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | Read second time. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2023 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2023 | In Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Read first time. To committee. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |