Senate | 06/06/2023 | (No further action taken.) | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read second time. Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To committee. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Placed on Second Reading File. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Read first time. To committee. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |