Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Chapter 399. (Effective July 1, 2023)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Assembly Amendment No. 1002 concurred in. To enrollment.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
In Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2023
|
To Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2023
|
From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2023
|
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2023
|
Dispensed with reprinting.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2023
|
Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1002.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2023
|
Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2023
|
To printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2023
|
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2023
|
In Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2023
|
From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2023
|
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2023
|
Reprinting dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2023
|
Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 934.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 852.) To printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Placed on Second Reading File.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Notice of exemption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Read first time. To committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
|
|
|