Senate | 06/15/2023 | Chapter 401. (Effective July 1, 2023) | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Approved by the Governor. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | In Senate. To enrollment. | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2023 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2023 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2023 | From committee: Do pass. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2023 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2023 | In Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | Read second time. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Placed on Second Reading File. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Notice of exemption. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Read first time. To committee. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |