Nevada 2023 Regular Session

Nevada Senate Bill SB99 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/06/2023

                             
 
- 	82nd Session (2023) 
Senate Bill No. 99–Senator Goicoechea 
 
CHAPTER.......... 
 
AN ACT making an appropriation to the Desert Research Institute 
of the Nevada System of Higher Education to support the 
Nevada State Cloud Seeding Program; and providing other 
matters properly relating thereto. 
EXPLANATION – Matter in bolded italics is new; matter between brackets [omitted material] is material to be omitted. 
 
THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEVADA, REPRESENTED IN 
SENATE AND ASSEMBLY, DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: 
 
 Section 1.  1. There is hereby appropriated from the State 
General Fund to the Desert Research Institute of the Nevada System 
of Higher Education to support the Nevada State Cloud Seeding 
Program administered by the Desert Research Institute the following 
sums: 
For the Fiscal Year 2023-2024 .................................. $600,000 
For the Fiscal Year 2024-2025 .................................. $600,000 
 2.  The Desert Research Institute shall: 
 (a) Prepare and transmit a report to the Interim Finance 
Committee on or before September 1, 2024, that describes each 
expenditure made from the money appropriated by subsection 1 
from the date on which the money was received by the Desert 
Research Institute through June 30, 2024; and 
 (b) Prepare and transmit a report to the Interim Finance 
Committee on or before September 1, 2025, that describes each 
expenditure made from the money appropriated by subsection 1 
from the date on which the money was received by the Desert 
Research Institute through June 30, 2025. 
 Sec. 2.  Any balance of the sums appropriated by section 1 of 
this act remaining at the end of the respective fiscal years must not 
be committed for expenditure after June 30 of the respective fiscal 
years by the entity to which the appropriation is made or any entity 
to which money from the appropriation is granted or otherwise 
transferred in any manner, and any portion of the appropriated 
money remaining must not be spent for any purpose after  
September 20, 2024, and September 19, 2025, respectively, by 
either the entity to which the money was appropriated or the entity 
to which the money was subsequently granted or transferred, and 
must be reverted to the State General Fund on or before  
September 20, 2024, and September 19, 2025, respectively. 
 
   
 	– 2 – 
 
 
- 	82nd Session (2023) 
 Sec. 3.  This act becomes effective on July 1, 2023. 
 
20 ~~~~~ 23