Senate | 05/15/2023 | File No. 22. (Effective May 8, 2023) | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | In Senate. To enrollment. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | Resolution read and adopted. To Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | In Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | From printer. To Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Resolution read and adopted. To printer. |