Senate | 04/17/2025 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | In Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2025 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2025 | Read second time. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2025 | From committee: Do pass. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2025 | From printer. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2025 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |