1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | (Reprinted with amendments adopted on April 21, 2025) |
---|
3 | 3 | | FIRST REPRINT S.B. 180 |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | - *SB180_R1* |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | SENATE BILL NO. 180–SENATOR FLORES |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | PREFILED FEBRUARY 3, 2025 |
---|
10 | 10 | | ____________ |
---|
11 | 11 | | |
---|
12 | 12 | | Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | SUMMARY—Revises provisions relating to motor carriers. |
---|
15 | 15 | | (BDR 58-963) |
---|
16 | 16 | | |
---|
17 | 17 | | FISCAL NOTE: Effect on Local Government: No. |
---|
18 | 18 | | Effect on the State: Yes. |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | ~ |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | EXPLANATION – Matter in bolded italics is new; matter between brackets [omitted material] is material to be omitted. |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | |
---|
25 | 25 | | AN ACT relating to motor carriers; establishing the minimum |
---|
26 | 26 | | amount of insurance against liability of which the Nevada |
---|
27 | 27 | | Transportation Authority of the Department of Business |
---|
28 | 28 | | and Industry and the Department of Motor Vehicles must |
---|
29 | 29 | | require certain motor carriers to file evidence, bond or |
---|
30 | 30 | | surety; and providing other matters properly relating |
---|
31 | 31 | | thereto. |
---|
32 | 32 | | Legislative Counsel’s Digest: |
---|
33 | 33 | | Existing law authorizes the Nevada Transportation Authority of the Department 1 |
---|
34 | 34 | | of Business and Industry and the Department of Motor Vehicles to require certain 2 |
---|
35 | 35 | | motor carriers to file with the Authority or the Department, as applicable, in a form 3 |
---|
36 | 36 | | required and approved by the Authority or the Department a liability insurance 4 |
---|
37 | 37 | | policy, or a certificate of insurance in lieu thereof, or a bond of a surety company, 5 |
---|
38 | 38 | | or other surety, in such reasonable sum as the Authority or the Department may 6 |
---|
39 | 39 | | deem necessary to protect adequately the interests of the public. (NRS 706.291) 7 |
---|
40 | 40 | | This bill requires the Authority or the Department to require the filing of such a 8 |
---|
41 | 41 | | policy, certificate, bond or other surety, in an amount not less than a certain 9 |
---|
42 | 42 | | minimum amount, by: (1) every fully regulated carrier which is subject to 10 |
---|
43 | 43 | | regulation by the Authority and authorized to transport only freight; and (2) every 11 |
---|
44 | 44 | | other common and contract motor carrier and every private carrier which is subject 12 |
---|
45 | 45 | | to regulation by the Department and authorized to transport intrastate-only freight 13 |
---|
46 | 46 | | by vehicles with a manufacturer’s gross vehicle weight rating of 26,000 pounds or 14 |
---|
47 | 47 | | more. Under this bill, the minimum amount of such a policy, certificate, bond 15 |
---|
48 | 48 | | or other surety is required to be: (1) on or after January 1, 2026, $1,000,000; (2) on 16 |
---|
49 | 49 | | or after January 1, 2028, $1,250,000; and (3) on or after January 1, 2030, 17 |
---|
50 | 50 | | $1,500,000. 18 |
---|
51 | 51 | | |
---|
52 | 52 | | |
---|
53 | 53 | | – 2 – |
---|
54 | 54 | | |
---|
55 | 55 | | |
---|
56 | 56 | | - *SB180_R1* |
---|
57 | 57 | | THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEVADA, REPRESENTED IN |
---|
58 | 58 | | SENATE AND ASSEMBLY, DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: |
---|
59 | 59 | | |
---|
60 | 60 | | Section 1. NRS 706.291 is hereby amended to read as follows: 1 |
---|
61 | 61 | | 706.291 1. [The] Except as otherwise provided in this 2 |
---|
62 | 62 | | subsection, the Authority shall require every fully regulated carrier 3 |
---|
63 | 63 | | and every operator of a tow car, within such time and in such 4 |
---|
64 | 64 | | amounts as the Authority may designate, to file with the Authority 5 |
---|
65 | 65 | | in a form required and approved by the Authority a liability 6 |
---|
66 | 66 | | insurance policy, or a certificate of insurance in lieu thereof, or a 7 |
---|
67 | 67 | | bond of a surety company, or other surety, in such reasonable sum 8 |
---|
68 | 68 | | as the Authority may deem necessary to protect adequately the 9 |
---|
69 | 69 | | interests of the public. The Authority shall require every fully 10 |
---|
70 | 70 | | regulated carrier which is authorized to transport only freight to 11 |
---|
71 | 71 | | file with the Authority in a form required and approved by the 12 |
---|
72 | 72 | | Authority a liability insurance policy, or a certificate of insurance 13 |
---|
73 | 73 | | in lieu thereof, or a bond of a surety company, or other surety: 14 |
---|
74 | 74 | | (a) On or after January 1, 2026, in an amount not less than 15 |
---|
75 | 75 | | $1,000,000; 16 |
---|
76 | 76 | | (b) On or after January 1, 2028, in an amount not less than 17 |
---|
77 | 77 | | $1,250,000; and 18 |
---|
78 | 78 | | (c) On or after January 1, 2030, in an amount not less than 19 |
---|
79 | 79 | | $1,500,000. 20 |
---|
80 | 80 | | 2. [The] Except as otherwise provided in this subsection, the 21 |
---|
81 | 81 | | Department shall require every other common and contract motor 22 |
---|
82 | 82 | | carrier and every private carrier, within such time and in such 23 |
---|
83 | 83 | | amounts as the Department may designate, to file with the 24 |
---|
84 | 84 | | Department in a form required and approved by the Department a 25 |
---|
85 | 85 | | liability insurance policy, or a certificate of insurance in lieu thereof, 26 |
---|
86 | 86 | | a bond of a surety company, or other surety, in such reasonable sum 27 |
---|
87 | 87 | | as the Department may deem necessary to protect adequately the 28 |
---|
88 | 88 | | interests of the public. In determining the amount of liability 29 |
---|
89 | 89 | | insurance or other surety required of a carrier pursuant to this 30 |
---|
90 | 90 | | subsection, the Department shall [create] : 31 |
---|
91 | 91 | | (a) Create a separate category for vehicles with a 32 |
---|
92 | 92 | | manufacturer’s gross vehicle weight rating of less than 26,000 33 |
---|
93 | 93 | | pounds and impose a lesser requirement with respect to such 34 |
---|
94 | 94 | | vehicles [.] ; and 35 |
---|
95 | 95 | | (b) Require every other common and contract motor carrier 36 |
---|
96 | 96 | | and every private carrier which is authorized to transport 37 |
---|
97 | 97 | | intrastate-only freight by the category of vehicles with a 38 |
---|
98 | 98 | | manufacturer’s gross vehicle weight rating of 26,000 pounds or 39 |
---|
99 | 99 | | more to file with the Department in a form required and approved 40 |
---|
100 | 100 | | by the Department a liability insurance policy, or a certificate of 41 |
---|
101 | 101 | | – 3 – |
---|
102 | 102 | | |
---|
103 | 103 | | |
---|
104 | 104 | | - *SB180_R1* |
---|
105 | 105 | | insurance in lieu thereof, or a bond of a surety company, or other 1 |
---|
106 | 106 | | surety: 2 |
---|
107 | 107 | | (1) On or after January 1, 2026, in an amount not less than 3 |
---|
108 | 108 | | $1,000,000; 4 |
---|
109 | 109 | | (2) On or after January 1, 2028, in an amount not less than 5 |
---|
110 | 110 | | $1,250,000; and 6 |
---|
111 | 111 | | (3) On or after January 1, 2030, in an amount not less than 7 |
---|
112 | 112 | | $1,500,000. 8 |
---|
113 | 113 | | 3. The liability insurance policy or certificate, policy or bond 9 |
---|
114 | 114 | | of a surety company or other surety must bind the obligors 10 |
---|
115 | 115 | | thereunder to pay the compensation for injuries to persons or for 11 |
---|
116 | 116 | | loss or damage to property resulting from the negligent operation of 12 |
---|
117 | 117 | | the carrier. 13 |
---|
118 | 118 | | 4. The Authority and the Department may jointly prescribe by 14 |
---|
119 | 119 | | regulation the respective amounts and forms required by subsections 15 |
---|
120 | 120 | | 1 and 2. 16 |
---|
121 | 121 | | Sec. 2. This act becomes effective: 17 |
---|
122 | 122 | | 1. Upon passage and approval for the purpose of adopting any 18 |
---|
123 | 123 | | regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative 19 |
---|
124 | 124 | | tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and 20 |
---|
125 | 125 | | 2. On October 1, 2025, for all other purposes. 21 |
---|
126 | 126 | | |
---|
127 | 127 | | H |
---|
128 | 128 | | |
---|
129 | 129 | | |
---|
130 | 130 | | |
---|