Nevada 2025 Regular Session

Nevada Senate Bill SB180 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 04/25/2025

                              
 (Reprinted with amendments adopted on April 21, 2025) 
 	FIRST REPRINT S.B. 180 
 
- *SB180_R1* 
 
SENATE BILL NO. 180–SENATOR FLORES 
 
PREFILED FEBRUARY 3, 2025 
____________ 
 
Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure 
 
SUMMARY—Revises provisions relating to motor carriers. 
(BDR 58-963) 
 
FISCAL NOTE: Effect on Local Government: No. 
 Effect on the State: Yes. 
 
~ 
 
EXPLANATION – Matter in bolded italics is new; matter between brackets [omitted material] is material to be omitted. 
 
 
AN ACT relating to motor carriers; establishing the minimum 
amount of insurance against liability of which the Nevada 
Transportation Authority of the Department of Business 
and Industry and the Department of Motor Vehicles must 
require certain motor carriers to file evidence, bond or 
surety; and providing other matters properly relating 
thereto. 
Legislative Counsel’s Digest: 
 Existing law authorizes the Nevada Transportation Authority of the Department 1 
of Business and Industry and the Department of Motor Vehicles to require certain 2 
motor carriers to file with the Authority or the Department, as applicable, in a form 3 
required and approved by the Authority or the Department a liability insurance 4 
policy, or a certificate of insurance in lieu thereof, or a bond of a surety company, 5 
or other surety, in such reasonable sum as the Authority or the Department may 6 
deem necessary to protect adequately the interests of the public. (NRS 706.291) 7 
This bill requires the Authority or the Department to require the filing of such a 8 
policy, certificate, bond or other surety, in an amount not less than a certain 9 
minimum amount, by: (1) every fully regulated carrier which is subject to 10 
regulation by the Authority and authorized to transport only freight; and (2) every 11 
other common and contract motor carrier and every private carrier which is subject 12 
to regulation by the Department and authorized to transport intrastate-only freight 13 
by vehicles with a manufacturer’s gross vehicle weight rating of 26,000 pounds or 14 
more. Under this bill, the minimum amount of such a policy, certificate, bond  15 
or other surety is required to be: (1) on or after January 1, 2026, $1,000,000; (2) on 16 
or after January 1, 2028, $1,250,000; and (3) on or after January 1, 2030, 17 
$1,500,000. 18 
 
   
 	– 2 – 
 
 
- *SB180_R1* 
THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEVADA, REPRESENTED IN 
SENATE AND ASSEMBLY, DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: 
 
 Section 1.  NRS 706.291 is hereby amended to read as follows: 1 
 706.291 1.  [The] Except as otherwise provided in this 2 
subsection, the Authority shall require every fully regulated carrier 3 
and every operator of a tow car, within such time and in such 4 
amounts as the Authority may designate, to file with the Authority 5 
in a form required and approved by the Authority a liability 6 
insurance policy, or a certificate of insurance in lieu thereof, or a 7 
bond of a surety company, or other surety, in such reasonable sum 8 
as the Authority may deem necessary to protect adequately the 9 
interests of the public. The Authority shall require every fully 10 
regulated carrier which is authorized to transport only freight to 11 
file with the Authority in a form required and approved by the 12 
Authority a liability insurance policy, or a certificate of insurance 13 
in lieu thereof, or a bond of a surety company, or other surety: 14 
 (a) On or after January 1, 2026, in an amount not less than 15 
$1,000,000; 16 
 (b) On or after January 1, 2028, in an amount not less than 17 
$1,250,000; and 18 
 (c) On or after January 1, 2030, in an amount not less than 19 
$1,500,000. 20 
 2.  [The] Except as otherwise provided in this subsection, the 21 
Department shall require every other common and contract motor 22 
carrier and every private carrier, within such time and in such 23 
amounts as the Department may designate, to file with the 24 
Department in a form required and approved by the Department a 25 
liability insurance policy, or a certificate of insurance in lieu thereof, 26 
a bond of a surety company, or other surety, in such reasonable sum 27 
as the Department may deem necessary to protect adequately the 28 
interests of the public. In determining the amount of liability 29 
insurance or other surety required of a carrier pursuant to this 30 
subsection, the Department shall [create] : 31 
 (a) Create a separate category for vehicles with a 32 
manufacturer’s gross vehicle weight rating of less than 26,000 33 
pounds and impose a lesser requirement with respect to such 34 
vehicles [.] ; and 35 
 (b) Require every other common and contract motor carrier 36 
and every private carrier which is authorized to transport 37 
intrastate-only freight by the category of vehicles with a 38 
manufacturer’s gross vehicle weight rating of 26,000 pounds or 39 
more to file with the Department in a form required and approved 40 
by the Department a liability insurance policy, or a certificate of 41   
 	– 3 – 
 
 
- *SB180_R1* 
insurance in lieu thereof, or a bond of a surety company, or other 1 
surety: 2 
  (1) On or after January 1, 2026, in an amount not less than 3 
$1,000,000; 4 
  (2) On or after January 1, 2028, in an amount not less than 5 
$1,250,000; and 6 
  (3) On or after January 1, 2030, in an amount not less than 7 
$1,500,000. 8 
 3.  The liability insurance policy or certificate, policy or bond 9 
of a surety company or other surety must bind the obligors 10 
thereunder to pay the compensation for injuries to persons or for 11 
loss or damage to property resulting from the negligent operation of 12 
the carrier. 13 
 4.  The Authority and the Department may jointly prescribe by 14 
regulation the respective amounts and forms required by subsections 15 
1 and 2. 16 
 Sec. 2.  This act becomes effective: 17 
 1. Upon passage and approval for the purpose of adopting any 18 
regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative 19 
tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and 20 
 2. On October 1, 2025, for all other purposes. 21 
 
H