Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.678 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1137 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8895 | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | amend by restoring to original print 860 | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | amended on third reading 860a | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.363 | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |