Assembly | 12/22/2023 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/22/2023 | vetoed memo.118 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1620 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S794 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.38 | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2023 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |