Assembly | 10/25/2023 | signed chap.553 | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1766 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6814 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.157 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | rules report cal.157 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules |