Assembly | 11/17/2023 | signed chap.643 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1647 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6184A | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.243 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.243 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | print number 5308a | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | amend and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2023 | referred to governmental operations |