Assembly | 05/31/2023 | substituted by s5734a | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.365 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.365 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2023 | print number 5773a | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2023 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | referred to ways and means |