Assembly | 07/28/2023 | signed chap.229 | ||
Assembly | 07/21/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1214 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6813A | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.599 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | rules report cal.599 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | print number 6781a | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to libraries and education technology | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | referred to libraries and education technology |