Assembly | 09/15/2023 | signed chap.409 | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1855 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7513 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.601 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | rules report cal.601 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | referred to economic development |