Assembly | 06/04/2024 | substituted by s6173b | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | rules report cal.392 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2024 | print number 7052c | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2024 | amend and recommit to election law | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to election law | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | print number 7052b | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | print number 7052a |