Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s8947a | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | rules report cal.636 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | print number 9847c | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | amend and recommit to local governments | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | print number 9847b | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | print number 9847a | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | referred to local governments |